NY S07496 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the office of court administration to pay certain judicial compensation to certain supreme court and appellate division justices for the period January 1, 2021 to June 14, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the office of court administration to pay certain judicial compensation to certain supreme court and appellate division justices for the period January 1, 2021 to June 14, 2021.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-30SenateSIGNED CHAP.185
2023-06-23SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.784
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a7654
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to judiciary
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1723
2023-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-31SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A07654 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7496

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback