NY S07493 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7391A
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes an occupancy tax of seven percent of the per diem rental rate of hotel rooms in the village of Weedsport, county of Cayuga; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes an occupancy tax of seven percent of the per diem rental rate of hotel rooms in the village of Weedsport, county of Cayuga; provides for the repeal of such provisions upon the expiration thereof.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-09SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7391A
2023-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1824
2023-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-31SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07391 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.308

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback