NY S07488 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the deposit of bar admission fees into the attorney licensing fund.
Title
Provides for the deposit of bar admission fees into the attorney licensing fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Sean Ryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1565 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |