NY S07485 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7485A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - PRINT NUMBER 7485A
Pending: Senate Alcoholism and Substance Abuse Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to provide contingency management services, including financial incentives, for persons with addiction disorders who abstain from substance abuse and comply with treatment objectives.
Title
Requires the office of alcoholism and substance abuse services to provide contingency management services, including financial incentives, for persons with addiction disorders who abstain from substance abuse and comply with treatment objectives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7485A |
2022-01-11 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ALCOHOLISM AND SUBSTANCE ABUSE |
2021-10-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08356 (Same As) 2022-01-07 - print number 8356a