NY S07483 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.541
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "hospital closure planning act"; provides that whenever a general hospital closes, the commissioner of health shall within thirty days of being notified of such closure, hold a public hearing at a location within the geographic area served by such general hospital to solicit testimony concerning the extent to which such closure will result in the reduction or elimination of health care services in the affected community, and options and proposals for replacing or enhancing such health care services through other means in order to meet the needs of residents in the affected community; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "hospital closure planning act"; provides that whenever a general hospital closes, the commissioner of health shall within thirty days of being notified of such closure, hold a public hearing at a location within the geographic area served by such general hospital to solicit testimony concerning the extent to which such closure will result in the reduction or elimination of health care services in the affected community, and options and proposals for replacing or enhancing such health care services through other means in order to meet the needs of residents in the affected community; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-01 SIGNED CHAP.541
2010-09-20 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-28 returned to senate
2010-06-28 passed assembly
2010-06-24 ordered to third reading rules cal.360
2010-06-24 substituted for a10748a
2010-06-24 referred to ways and means
2010-06-24 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-24 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-23 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1144
2010-06-23 COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2010-06-15 PRINT NUMBER 7483A
2010-06-15 AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2010-04-14 REFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A10748 (Same As) 2010-06-24 - substituted by s7483a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback