NY S07478 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7425
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain provisions relating to expanding the child health insurance plan until 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends certain provisions relating to expanding the child health insurance plan until 2025.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-07SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7425
2023-06-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1561
2023-06-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-30SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A07425 (Same As) 2023-06-30 - signed chap.165

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback