NY S07477 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7393
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of the public health law related to the redeployment of excess reserves of certain not-for-profit managed care organizations until 2025.
Title
Extends provisions of the public health law related to the redeployment of excess reserves of certain not-for-profit managed care organizations until 2025.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7393 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1560 |
2023-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A07393 (Same As) 2023-07-19 - signed chap.197