NY S07475 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - SIGNED CHAP.673
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - SIGNED CHAP.673
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for regulating immigration bail businesses including restrictions on who may operate such a business; provides for who may bring an action against an immigration bail business.
Title
Provides for regulating immigration bail businesses including restrictions on who may operate such a business; provides for who may bring an action against an immigration bail business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 99 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.673 |
2022-12-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.454 |
2022-06-03 | Assembly | substituted for a7770c |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1808 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7475B |
2022-05-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7475A |
2022-05-11 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
2021-10-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07770 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - substituted by s7475b