NY S07471 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - VETOED MEMO.149
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the ability of the Randolph Academy union free school district to acquire, purchase, lease or otherwise operate territory for use by the school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the ability of the Randolph Academy union free school district to acquire, purchase, lease or otherwise operate territory for use by the school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblyVETOED MEMO.149
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.568
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a10337
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to education
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-06-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1036
2012-05-25SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO EDUCATION
2012-05-23SenateREFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10337 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7471

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback