NY S07468 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.670
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system for Marc Del Prado.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Tier IV status in the New York state and local employees' retirement system for Marc Del Prado.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-17SenateSIGNED CHAP.670
2023-11-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.783
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a7616
2023-06-05Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-05SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-05SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-05SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1599
2023-06-05SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-30SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07616 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7468

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback