NY S07464 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - SIGNED CHAP.396
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the compliance period during which to obtain a tax abatement for solar electric generating systems.
Title
Relates to extending the compliance period during which to obtain a tax abatement for solar electric generating systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Lanza [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.396 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.485 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9680 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 7464A |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1040 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09680 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7464a