NY S07462 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to extending the tax credit for biotechnology against the general corporation tax, unincorporated business tax, and banking corporation tax in certain cities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to extending the tax credit for biotechnology against the general corporation tax, unincorporated business tax, and banking corporation tax in certain cities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.429
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.367
2012-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10352
2012-06-11Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-05SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-04Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-05-31Senate1ST REPORT CAL.980
2012-05-22SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A10352 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7462

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback