NY S07460 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-27 - SIGNED CHAP.498
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends provisions of law relating to the adoption and submission of an annual budget by the Trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton from January 1, 2024 until January 1, 2025.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends provisions of law relating to the adoption and submission of an annual budget by the Trustees of the Freeholders and Commonalty of the town of Southampton from January 1, 2024 until January 1, 2025.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-30 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-09-27SenateSIGNED CHAP.498
2023-09-19SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-08Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-08Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-08Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-08Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.740
2023-06-08Assemblysubstituted for a7645
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1448
2023-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-26SenateREFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

Same As/Similar To

A07645 (Same As) 2023-06-08 - substituted by s7460

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback