NY S07452 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8322A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8322A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a council on children and families within the executive department; moves such council from the office of children and family services; defines terms; authorizes the governor to designate the executive director of such council; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes a council on children and families within the executive department; moves such council from the office of children and family services; defines terms; authorizes the governor to designate the executive director of such council; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Senate - Senate Children And Families Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8322A |
2024-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-17 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.823 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7452A |
2024-02-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1597 |
2023-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A08322 (Same As) 2024-08-28 - signed chap.235