NY S07451 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.540
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows child care providers to organize themselves and select representatives for the purposes of discussing with the State the conditions of their employment and the operations of child care programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows child care providers to organize themselves and select representatives for the purposes of discussing with the State the conditions of their employment and the operations of child care programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 110 N: 35 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-10-01 SIGNED CHAP.540
2010-09-20 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-29 returned to senate
2010-06-29 passed assembly
2010-06-29 ordered to third reading cal.962
2010-06-29 substituted for a10764
2010-06-17 referred to labor
2010-06-17 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-17 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-16 ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1022
2010-06-15 COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2010-06-07 REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2010-04-12 REFERRED TO LABOR

Same As/Similar To

A10764 (Same As) 2010-06-29 - substituted by s7451

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback