NY S07440 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
Pending: Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
Pending: Senate Procurement and Contracts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that guidelines by the state procurement council shall include certain preferences for any business located in a county within the state with a population of less than one million based on the latest federal decennial census or any small business as such term is defined in section one hundred thirty-one of the economic development law.
Title
Provides that guidelines by the state procurement council shall include certain preferences for any business located in a county within the state with a population of less than one million based on the latest federal decennial census or any small business as such term is defined in section one hundred thirty-one of the economic development law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS |
2021-11-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7440B |
2021-11-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2021-11-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7440A |
2021-11-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2021-10-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |