NY S07431 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that each state agency that maintains a website shall ensure its website provides for online submission of requests for records subject to FOIL.
Title
Provides that each state agency that maintains a website shall ensure its website provides for online submission of requests for records subject to FOIL.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.47 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.157 |
2018-03-14 | Assembly | substituted for a2131 |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.365 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A02131 (Same As) 2018-03-14 - substituted by s7431