NY S07427 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the metropolitan commuter transportation authority establishing and implementing a policy for responsible management of vegetation and other activities that impact neighboring properties in order to preserve the safety and efficiency of commuter rail operations by implementing guidelines for removal and management policies.
Title
Relates to the metropolitan commuter transportation authority establishing and implementing a policy for responsible management of vegetation and other activities that impact neighboring properties in order to preserve the safety and efficiency of commuter rail operations by implementing guidelines for removal and management policies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-31 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7427B |
2022-05-24 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7427A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1274 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-10-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |