NY S07427 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9902A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9902A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies the early childhood advisory council to promote a comprehensive and high quality early childhood system.
Title
Codifies the early childhood advisory council to promote a comprehensive and high quality early childhood system.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9902A |
2016-06-09 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1647 |
2016-06-09 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-05-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7427A |
2016-05-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09902 (Same As) 2016-11-04 - approval memo.8