NY S07426 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 7426A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-20 - PRINT NUMBER 7426A
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.
Title
Requires the office of children and family services to utilize a cost estimation model when determining the actual cost providers incur when providing child care and requires the office to prepare an annual report detailing such.
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Avella [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7426A |
2016-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO CHILDREN AND FAMILIES |
Same As/Similar To
A09900 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - REFERRED TO RULES