NY S07425 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the court to consider a child's health and safety when making a decision regarding child custody and visitation; directs presumptions that may be made by the court and admissibility of certain evidence in such cases; requires court officials to take part in training to handle such cases regarding domestic violence and child abuse.
Title
Requires the court to consider a child's health and safety when making a decision regarding child custody and visitation; directs presumptions that may be made by the court and admissibility of certain evidence in such cases; requires court officials to take part in training to handle such cases regarding domestic violence and child abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-23 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7425A |
2022-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.578 |
2022-01-07 | Senate | REFERENCE CHANGED TO JUDICIARY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-10-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05398 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - print number 5398a