NY S07419 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.208
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes Isaac B. Bertos to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Ilion, notwithstanding the age requirements under the civil service law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes Isaac B. Bertos to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Ilion, notwithstanding the age requirements under the civil service law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-07-19SenateSIGNED CHAP.208
2023-07-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-09Assemblyhome rule request
2023-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.798
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a7582
2023-06-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2023-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1717
2023-06-07SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-24SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A07582 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7419

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback