NY S07418 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-19 - SIGNED CHAP.207
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Brett W. Brewer to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Ilion, notwithstanding the age requirements under the civil service law.
Title
Authorizes Brett W. Brewer to take the competitive civil service examination for the position of police officer and be placed on the eligible list for employment as a full-time police officer for the village of Ilion, notwithstanding the age requirements under the civil service law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-19 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.207 |
2023-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.799 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | substituted for a7620 |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2023-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1716 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2023-05-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07620 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7418