NY S07416 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 30 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - ordered to third reading rules cal.390
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits restrictions on insurance policies based solely on the policyholder harboring or owning any dog of a specific breed or mixture of breeds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits restrictions on insurance policies based solely on the policyholder harboring or owning any dog of a specific breed or mixture of breeds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-04Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.390
2024-06-04Assemblysubstituted for a6867b
2024-05-30Assemblyreferred to insurance
2024-05-30SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-30SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-22SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-21Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-20Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1255
2024-05-16SenatePRINT NUMBER 7416B
2024-05-16SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2023-06-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 7416A
2023-06-01SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2023-05-24SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A06867 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - substituted by s7416b

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback