NY S07415 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - SIGNED CHAP.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on September 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-24 - SIGNED CHAP.272
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the leasing of companion animals; prohibits using companion animals as security for a contract.
Title
Prohibits the leasing of companion animals; prohibits using companion animals as security for a contract.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Marcellino [R] | Sen. Jesse Hamilton [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] |
Sen. Terrence Murphy [R] | Sen. Elaine Phillips [R] | Sen. James Tedisco [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-24 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.272 |
2018-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.180 |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a10082b |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED 7415C |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1322 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7415B |
2018-04-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7415A |
2018-03-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO JUDICIARY |
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A10082 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - substituted by s7415c