NY S07412 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the board of assessment review not take less than ten business days to meet to hear complaints in relation to assessments.
Title
Requires that the board of assessment review not take less than ten business days to meet to hear complaints in relation to assessments.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1191 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09649 (Same As) 2018-01-30 - referred to real property taxation