NY S07397 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-14 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides vendor fees for vendor tracks located in the county of Genesee and within forty miles of a Native American class III gaming facility.
Title
Provides vendor fees for vendor tracks located in the county of Genesee and within forty miles of a Native American class III gaming facility.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Christopher Jacobs [R] | Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1795 |
2018-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7397A |
2018-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2018-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10073 (Same As) 2018-06-01 - print number 10073a