NY S07392 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to prohibiting the use of ballast water to increase a wake within six hundred feet from shore on lakes within the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to prohibiting the use of ballast water to increase a wake within six hundred feet from shore on lakes within the state.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20SenateCOMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-27SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-02-13Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-02-12Senate1ST REPORT CAL.451
2018-01-11SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback