NY S07384 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a tax credit for a taxpayer employing a person who is in recovery with an office of alcoholism and substance abuse services approved rehabilitation center.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows a tax credit for a taxpayer employing a person who is in recovery with an office of alcoholism and substance abuse services approved rehabilitation center.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-05-07SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-05-07SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-01SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.931
2018-05-01SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-02-13SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-11SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08830 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback