NY S07378 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - APPROVAL MEMO.70
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to publish certain reports on the department's website detailing sales of opioids sold in the state; requires the department of health to compile and publish on its website all reports submitted to the department detailing all opioids sold by a registrant in the state of New York including the initial report with transaction information from July 1, 2019 through December 31, 2019 and each annual report thereafter within ninety days.
Title
Requires the department of health to publish certain reports on the department's website detailing sales of opioids sold in the state; requires the department of health to compile and publish on its website all reports submitted to the department detailing all opioids sold by a registrant in the state of New York including the initial report with transaction information from July 1, 2019 through December 31, 2019 and each annual report thereafter within ninety days.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.70 |
2022-12-23 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.771 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.391 |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | substituted for a8339a |
2022-04-27 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-04-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-03-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-03-08 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.638 |
2022-01-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7378A |
2022-01-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-09-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08339 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - substituted by s7378a