NY S07373 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7189
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Extends certain provisions relating to the boarding of out of state incarcerated individuals until September 1, 2026.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extends certain provisions relating to the boarding of out of state incarcerated individuals until September 1, 2026.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-05SenateSUBSTITUTED BY A7189
2023-05-30SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1425
2023-05-30SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-05-22SenateREFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION

Same As/Similar To

A07189 (Same As) 2023-08-23 - signed chap.302

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback