NY S07365 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3409A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A3409A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a credit for purchase, construction or retrofitting of a principal residence to achieve universal visitability pursuant to guidelines developed by the division of code enforcement and administration within the department of state; caps tax credits awarded at 1 million dollars per year for 5 years.
Title
Relates to a credit for purchase, construction or retrofitting of a principal residence to achieve universal visitability pursuant to guidelines developed by the division of code enforcement and administration within the department of state; caps tax credits awarded at 1 million dollars per year for 5 years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Revenue Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A3409A |
2022-06-01 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1830 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-10 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7365A |
2022-03-10 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO BUDGET AND REVENUE |
2021-09-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03409 (Same As) 2022-12-23 - tabled