NY S07362 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-17 - SIGNED CHAP.668
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a city with a population of one million inhabitants or more, or any district, board or agency with jurisdiction exclusively within such city, to authorize or require bids and offers for any contract to be submitted in an electronic format; provides such city, district, board or agency may conduct a public opening and reading of bids or identification of offerers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows a city with a population of one million inhabitants or more, or any district, board or agency with jurisdiction exclusively within such city, to authorize or require bids and offers for any contract to be submitted in an electronic format; provides such city, district, board or agency may conduct a public opening and reading of bids or identification of offerers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-11-17SenateSIGNED CHAP.668
2023-11-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.848
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a7685
2023-06-10Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2023-06-10SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-10SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1822
2023-06-08SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2023-06-07SenatePRINT NUMBER 7362A
2023-06-07SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS
2023-05-19SenateREFERRED TO PROCUREMENT AND CONTRACTS

Same As/Similar To

A07685 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7362a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback