NY S07362 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain individuals to file financial disclosure forms.
Title
Requires certain individuals to file financial disclosure forms.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1049 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7362A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ETHICS AND INTERNAL GOVERNANCE |
2021-09-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04847 (Same As) 2022-04-28 - print number 4847a