NY S07359 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - referred to local governments
Pending: Assembly Local Governments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to youth programs sponsored by fire departments; provides that participants may respond to an emergency or hazardous activity, but shall remain in an appropriate and safe designated area that has been established by the chief or officer in charge; provides such participants cannot respond to an emergency on a vehicle using lights and/or sirens; provides such participants may not enter a burning structure; protects volunteer fire departments and fire companies from certain criminal and civil liability potentially arising from the operation of a youth program.
Title
Relates to youth programs sponsored by fire departments; provides that participants may respond to an emergency or hazardous activity, but shall remain in an appropriate and safe designated area that has been established by the chief or officer in charge; provides such participants cannot respond to an emergency on a vehicle using lights and/or sirens; provides such participants may not enter a burning structure; protects volunteer fire departments and fire companies from certain criminal and civil liability potentially arising from the operation of a youth program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-02 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMENDED 7359A |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.939 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2021-09-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08100 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - print number 8100a