NY S07344 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-15 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "toll payer protection act" to establish a New York toll payers' bill of rights; provides that any person, firm, corporation, or other entity who is charged with the payment of a cashless toll fee in the state of New York shall have the option to be notified by text message or electronic mail that such fee has been so charged, the entity to which such fee must be paid, and the date by when such fee must be paid; further provides for the establishment of a payment plan for the payment of a toll fee and any related penalties; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "toll payer protection act" to establish a New York toll payers' bill of rights; provides that any person, firm, corporation, or other entity who is charged with the payment of a cashless toll fee in the state of New York shall have the option to be notified by text message or electronic mail that such fee has been so charged, the entity to which such fee must be paid, and the date by when such fee must be paid; further provides for the establishment of a payment plan for the payment of a toll fee and any related penalties; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-03-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.601 |
2018-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7344A |
2018-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2018-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09805 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - tabled