NY S07341 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a one time fee of one hundred dollars for the registration of historic motor vehicles.
Title
Provides a one time fee of one hundred dollars for the registration of historic motor vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-03-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-03-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-01-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.216 |
2018-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04747 (Same As) 2018-01-03 - referred to transportation