NY S07325 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.379
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-29 - SIGNED CHAP.379
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an energy system tax stabilization reserve fund in the Lowville Central School District to lessen or prevent increases in the school district's real property tax levy resulting from decreases in revenue due to changes in or termination of the payments in lieu of taxes receivable by the school district.
Title
Establishes an energy system tax stabilization reserve fund in the Lowville Central School District to lessen or prevent increases in the school district's real property tax levy resulting from decreases in revenue due to changes in or termination of the payments in lieu of taxes receivable by the school district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-29 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.379 |
2016-09-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.455 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10016b |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1823 |
2016-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7325B |
2016-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2016-06-08 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7325A |
2016-06-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2016-05-16 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10016 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7325b