NY S07321 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.19
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the appointment of a monitor to oversee the Hempstead union free school district.
Title
Authorizes the appointment of a monitor to oversee the Hempstead union free school district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.19 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.350 |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | substituted for a9079a |
2020-01-21 | Assembly | referred to education |
2020-01-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.208 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09079 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.19