NY S07313 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.34
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing an internet mapping resource of child care providers and afterschool programs; relates to administration of afterschool programs.
Title
Relates to establishing an internet mapping resource of child care providers and afterschool programs; relates to administration of afterschool programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.34 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.620 |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | substituted for a8991 |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to children and families |
2018-01-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.41 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08991 (Same As) 2018-01-29 - substituted by s7313