NY S07312 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a child care availability taskforce to evaluate the need for and availability of child care throughout the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a child care availability taskforce to evaluate the need for and availability of child care throughout the state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18AssemblySIGNED CHAP.33
2018-04-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-02-05Assemblypassed assembly
2018-02-05Assemblyordered to third reading cal.632
2018-02-05Assemblysubstituted for a9003
2018-01-23Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2018-01-23SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-23SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-01-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.40
2018-01-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A09003 (Same As) 2018-02-05 - substituted by s7312

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback