NY S07306 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration, and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices; qualifies fund availability from the elevator and related conveyances safety program account; specifies what is not included in the definition of elevator work; sets forth qualifications and exemptions for licensing as an elevator agency technician; repeals certain sections of the labor law and the administrative code of the city of New York and changes the effective date for the licensing requirements of persons engaged in design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators to two years after the act takes effect.
Title
Relates to the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration, and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices; qualifies fund availability from the elevator and related conveyances safety program account; specifies what is not included in the definition of elevator work; sets forth qualifications and exemptions for licensing as an elevator agency technician; repeals certain sections of the labor law and the administrative code of the city of New York and changes the effective date for the licensing requirements of persons engaged in design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators to two years after the act takes effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-27 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.198 |
2020-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09063 (Same As) 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken