NY S07306 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10532A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10532A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to derivative transactions and over the counter derivative instruments.
Title
Relates to derivative transactions and over the counter derivative instruments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10532A |
2012-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7306B |
2012-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.998 |
2012-05-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7306A |
2012-05-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A10532 (Same As) 2012-08-17 - signed chap.398