NY S07304 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.25
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the transmission of reports of missing persons to the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System within thirty days when such person may be at immediate risk of death or injury or a match to a record maintained in the NamUs database or within one hundred eighty days in any other case.
Title
Requires the transmission of reports of missing persons to the National Missing and Unidentified Persons System within thirty days when such person may be at immediate risk of death or injury or a match to a record maintained in the NamUs database or within one hundred eighty days in any other case.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.25 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.654 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8942 |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-01-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.32 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08942 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7304