NY S07292 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to lead paint remediation reporting for the metropolitan transportation authority's and the New York city transit authority's aboveground transit infrastructure.
Title
Relates to lead paint remediation reporting for the metropolitan transportation authority's and the New York city transit authority's aboveground transit infrastructure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.18 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.683 |
2018-02-27 | Assembly | substituted for a8987 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2018-02-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.20 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08987 (Same As) 2018-02-27 - substituted by s7292