NY S07288 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the operation of rowboats, canoes and kayaks.
Title
Relates to the operation of rowboats, canoes and kayaks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-06 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-06-05 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1109 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10073 (Same As) 2012-05-02 - referred to transportation