NY S07286 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes William Schumaker and Mark Hennessy to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes William Schumaker and Mark Hennessy to receive certain service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1541 |
2022-05-25 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-03-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7286A |
2022-03-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-07-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A05304 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - ordered to third reading rules cal.525