NY S07285 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a temporary state taskforce to examine, evaluate and make recommendations concerning child abuse and neglect prevention efforts in the state with the goal of preventing child removals, lowering foster care placements and increasing family reunification.
Title
Establishes a temporary state taskforce to examine, evaluate and make recommendations concerning child abuse and neglect prevention efforts in the state with the goal of preventing child removals, lowering foster care placements and increasing family reunification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.12 |
2018-04-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.657 |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted for a8945 |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2018-01-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-01-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-01-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.13 |
2018-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08945 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7285