NY S07268 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A697D
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A697D
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requirements for pet dealers for the care and sale of cats and dogs; requires the implementation of an appropriate plan for the exercise of animals in their possession.
Title
Relates to requirements for pet dealers for the care and sale of cats and dogs; requires the implementation of an appropriate plan for the exercise of animals in their possession.
Sponsors
Sen. Greg Ball [R] | Sen. Dean Skelos [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Mark Grisanti [R] |
Sen. Kenneth LaValle [R] | Sen. Suzi Oppenheimer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A697D |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7268A |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.752 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A00697 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.110