NY S07251 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.348
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Poughkeepsie to sell and convey certain waterfront property to a private entity for public benefit.
Title
Authorizes the city of Poughkeepsie to sell and convey certain waterfront property to a private entity for public benefit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.348 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.424 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a10098b |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7251B |
2012-05-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.914 |
2012-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7251A |
2012-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10098 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7251b